This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/18/2023 at 13:26:06 (UTC).

FLORES VS WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 FLORES filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against WILLIAMS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0012

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FLORES, ALISA

Respondent

WILLIAMS, LARRY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

12/02/2022

DocketFile Type: Civil Harassment Restraining Order After Hearing (CH-130)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2022

HearingHearing Type: Petition for Harassment; Dept.: Lamont Division B; Result: Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2022

DocketFile Type: Proof of Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2022

DocketFile Type: Temporary Restraining Order (CH-110); Filed By: PETITIONER - FLORES, ALISA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2022

DocketFile Type: Notice of Court Hearing (CH-109); Filed By: PETITIONER - FLORES, ALISA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2022

DocketFile Type: Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted; Filed By: PETITIONER - FLORES, ALISA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022

DocketFile Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed By: PETITIONER - FLORES, ALISA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022

DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PETITIONER - FLORES, ALISA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2022

DocketFile Type: Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (CH-100); Filed By: PETITIONER - FLORES, ALISA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less