Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 07/16/2021 at 05:50:13 (UTC).

FLORES VS GENERAL MOTORS

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 FLORES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2413

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FLORES, ALBERT

FLORES, DIANA

Defendants

GENERAL MOTORS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARRY, DAVID N

Defendant Attorney

MAJOR, CAMERON M

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel 06/18/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Plaintiffs: ALBERT FLORES; DIANA FLORES Motion to Compel Defendant General Motors Llc, Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents Nos 1,6,9,17,19,24 -25, 27, 31, 33, 37-38, 41-42,45, and 54-55 CONT'D FROM 6/11/21

Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel 06/11/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 4/23/2021 Plaintiffs: ALBERT FLORES; DIANA FLORES Motion to Compel Defendant General Motors Llc, Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents Nos 1,6,9,17,19,24 -25, 27, 31, 33, 37-38, 41-42,45, and 54-55

Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel 06/09/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 04/23/2021 Plaintiffs: ALBERT FLORES; DIANA FLORES Motion to compel Defendant General Motors LLC's Verification to its Original Discovery Response and to Compel Further Verified Response to Form Interrogatory 12.1

Motion (Pre-Disposition)

Motion (Pre-Disposition) 05/14/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 4/15/2021 Plaintiffs, ALBERT FLORES; DIANA FLORES Motion for Relief from Jury Trial Waiver by Failing to Timely Post Jury Fees

Motion to Strike

Motion to Strike 04/14/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 2/22/2021 Defendant, GENERAL MOTORS, LLC Motion to Strike Punitive Damages from Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/29/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: David N. Barry Re: Summons Reason: Duplicate filing. Summons were a duplicate of civil cover sheet.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: t/e 4 days JURY FOR PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: J/T & FSC SET 10/3/22 9AM DEPT 11 T/E 5 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel - Motion to Compel 06/18/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Plaintiffs: ALBERT FLORES; DIANA FLORES Motion to Compel Defendant General Motors Llc, Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents Nos 1,6,9,17,19,24 -25, 27, 31, 33, 37-38, 41-42,45, and 54-55 CONT'D FROM 6/11/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketSeparate Statement - Comment: in support of Opposition to Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Cameron Major in support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketOpposition - Comment: to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Requests for Production of Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel - Motion to Compel 06/11/2021: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 4/23/2021 Plaintiffs: ALBERT FLORES; DIANA FLORES Motion to Compel Defendant General Motors Llc, Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents Nos 1,6,9,17,19,24 -25, 27, 31, 33, 37-38, 41-42,45, and 54-55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Cameron Major In Support Of Defendant General Motors LLC's Demurrer and Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketDemurrer - Comment: General Motors LLC's Notice of Demurrer and Demurrer to Plaintiffs' Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Meet and Confer) - Comment: Declaration of Cameron Major, Esq. Pursuant to CCP 430.41 Re: Efforts to Meet and Confer Prior to Filing Demurrer to Complaint and Automatic Extension of Deadline to Respond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to General Motors, LLC / Personal Service (Authorized Agent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 01/29/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: David N. Barry Re: Summons Reason: Duplicate filing. Summons were a duplicate of civil cover sheet.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAJOR CAMERON