This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/22/2023 at 09:44:30 (UTC).

FLETES ET AL VS ENLIGHTENMENT INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/24/2022 FLETES filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ENLIGHTENMENT INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1256

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FLETES, JOSE ROBERTO

FLETES, YOVANA

Defendants

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN, OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THIS COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO THE PLAINTIFFS TITLE, OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFFS TITLE THERETO

ENLIGHTENMENT INVESTMENT GROUP, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MRA AESTHETIC SOLUTIONS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

RICHARD E. CAGLE, AN INDIVIDUAL AND HEIR TO RANAE SANDRINI, A.K.A. VIVIAN RANAE

THE TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS OF RANAE SANDRINI, A.K.A. VIVIAN RANAE SAND

CHERI REEDER, AN INDIVIDUAL AND HEIR TO RANAE SANDRINI, A.K.A. VIVIAN RANAE SANDRINI, DECEDENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUTCHISON SUSAN M

 

Court Documents

Affidavit

07/19/2022: Affidavit

Affidavit

07/15/2022: Affidavit

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

07/08/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

06/30/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

06/20/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Order to Show Cause

05/31/2022: Order to Show Cause

Electronic Rejection Notice

05/31/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Miscellaneous Filing

05/24/2022: Miscellaneous Filing

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

05/24/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Electronic Rejection Notice

01/12/2023: Electronic Rejection Notice

Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

12/09/2022: Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

Request For Entry of Default Not Entered

12/05/2022: Request For Entry of Default Not Entered

Electronic Rejection Notice

12/02/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

Case Management Conference

11/28/2022: Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

11/14/2022: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Request For Entry of Default Not Entered

11/10/2022: Request For Entry of Default Not Entered

Case Management Statement

11/15/2022: Case Management Statement

Electronic Rejection Notice

11/14/2022: Electronic Rejection Notice

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Dept.: Bakersfield Division L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered; Comment: As to Doe 1 Cheri Reeder an individual and heir to Ranae Sandrini, aka Vivian Ranae Sandrini, decedent on complaint filed 5/24/22; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - FLETES, JOSE ROBERTO|PLAINTIFF - FLETES, YOVANA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request For Entry of Default Not Entered; Comment: 1b Incomplete lacking parties does not conform to the Complaint.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - FLETES, JOSE ROBERTO|PLAINTIFF - FLETES, YOVANA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: re; Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division L; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - FLETES, JOSE ROBERTO|PLAINTIFF - FLETES, YOVANA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110; Dept.: Bakersfield Division L; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: RE: Case Management Statement; The form is outdated. Please use the 2021 revised form.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Affidavit; Comment: of due diligence as to Enlightenment Investment Group, LLC, a California limited liability company, 4 attempts; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - FLETES, JOSE ROBERTO|PLAINTIFF - FLETES, YOVANA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Affidavit; Comment: of Diligence as to MRA Aesthetic Solutions, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - FLETES, JOSE ROBERTO|PLAINTIFF - FLETES, YOVANA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to ENLIGHTENMENT INVESTMENTGROUP, LLC, a California Limited LiabilityCompany, VIA SUBSERVICE; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - FLETES, JOSE ROBERTO|PLAINTIFF - FLETES, YOVANA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Richard E Cagle, an individual and heir to Ranae Sandrini, aka Vivian Ranae Sandrini, decedent, via personal service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - FLETES, JOSE ROBERTO|PLAINTIFF - FLETES, YOVANA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - FLETES, JOSE ROBERTO|PLAINTIFF - FLETES, YOVANA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 09/13/2022Hearing Time: 8:30 AMHearing Department/Division: L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Electronic Rejection Notice; Comment: Summons: Filing is not in compliance with CRC 2.100-2.119. Please use appropriate size font, use attachment page if necessary.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Miscellaneous Filing; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - FLETES, JOSE ROBERTO|PLAINTIFF - FLETES, YOVANA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - FLETES, JOSE ROBERTO|PLAINTIFF - FLETES, YOVANA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - FLETES, JOSE ROBERTO|PLAINTIFF - FLETES, YOVANA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MRA AESTHETIC SOLUTIONS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS OF PAWLO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUTCHISON SUSAN M. ESQ.