This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/23/2020 at 08:55:26 (UTC).

FLAGSHIP CREDIT ACCEPTANCE LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS FLORES

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 FLAGSHIP CREDIT ACCEPTANCE LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FLORES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4061

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLAGSHIP CREDIT ACCEPTANCE LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

FLORES, JULIO CESAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURSTEIN, ARDEN D.

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: TO: Arden Burstein Re: Civil Case Cover Sheet Reason:Please resubmit the correct Civil Case Cover Sheet that conforms with the Complaint and Summons. Thank you

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 3/29/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:12

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCourt Use Only - Pre-Cleared Regular - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: motion for writ of possession; jose 323-993-0500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: TO: Arden Burstein Re: Civil Case Cover Sheet Reason:Please resubmit the correct Civil Case Cover Sheet that conforms with the Complaint and Summons. Thank you

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 3/29/2021 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less