This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:31:17 (UTC).

FIVE STAR MANAGEMEMT SERVICES, INC. VS TURNEY

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 FIVE STAR MANAGEMEMT SERVICES, INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TURNEY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5921

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIVE STAR MANAGEMEMT SERVICES, INC.

Defendants

TURNEY, TRAVIS

WARREN, BRITTANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KUMMER, DIXON G

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (UD) - Comment: without prejudice, entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS. NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: FIVE STAR MANAGEMEMT SERVICES, INC.; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 4212 ORRICK CT #D, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93308

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less