This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:28:47 (UTC).

FISHMAN VS ALDERETE

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 FISHMAN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALDERETE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5900

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FISHMAN, LYUDMILA

Defendants

ALDERETE, WENDY

ALDERETE, WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS NOT LISTED ON DEFAULT OR JUDGMNET, BUT LISTED ON THE WRIT. ALL DOCUMENTS MUST CONFORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: FISHMAN, LYUDMILA; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 12202 Arbor Park Place Bakersfield, CA 93311; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: ALDERETE, WILLIAM; ALDERETE, WENDY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: RETURN F BIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: William Alderete and Wendy Alderete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS NOT LISTED ON DEFAULT OR JUDGMNET, BUT LISTED ON THE WRIT. ALL DOCUMENTS MUST CONFORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: FISHMAN, LYUDMILA; Served: 10/20/2017; Served: 10/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 12202 ARBOR PARK PLACE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93311

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less