This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 10:36:12 (UTC).

FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA VS HORNING

Case Summary

On 10/07/2015 FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HORNING. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0151

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA

Defendant

HORNING, MIRIAM D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACLEOD, JAMES

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV); Party: Names: FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA; HORNING, MIRIAM D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) (After Cond Settlement/Stay)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Conditional (JBSIS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.