This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/22/2020 at 07:18:24 (UTC).

FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA, A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION VS RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA, A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0002

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA, A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION

Defendant

RODRIGUEZ, JUAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACLEOD, JAMES

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling Accepting Answer 03/12/2020: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: striking 3/9/20 Ruling; Answer accepted

Ruling

Ruling Striking Answer 03/09/2020: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Fee Waiver-Hearing on Waiver of Fees (Pre-Disposition)

Fee Waiver-Hearing on Waiver of Fees (Pre-Disposition) 02/26/2020: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: **Closed Hearing** as to Juan Rodriguez

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: **Hearing continued from 05/11/20 pursuant to Standing Order**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: Request for Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling Accepting Answer 03/12/2020: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: striking 3/9/20 Ruling; Answer accepted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling Striking Answer 03/09/2020: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: striking Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFee Waiver-Hearing on Waiver of Fees (Pre-Disposition) - Fee Waiver-Hearing on Waiver of Fees (Pre-Disposition) 02/26/2020: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: **Closed Hearing** as to Juan Rodriguez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference - Comment: 5/11/20 8:30am Dept. 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: as to Juan Rodriguez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Juan Rodiguez via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 01/12/202011:43 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(f) (N23F):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d) - Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.