This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 12:31:01 (UTC).

FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA, A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION VS KEITH

Case Summary

On 10/25/2016 FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA, A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KEITH. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stainfield, Bryan K. and Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0575

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF OMAHA, A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION

Defendant

KEITH, DAVID A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACLEOD, JAMES

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketCase Destroyed Pursuant to Government Code Section - Comment: 68153

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: RE: DESTRUCTION OF RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketAmended Request - Comment: for dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • DocketStipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Comment: for entry of judgment in the event of default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: DAVID A KEITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE-CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.