Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 00:17:25 (UTC).

FIRST AMENDMENT AND RESTATEMENT OF THE HOLLIS B CARLILE AND JACQUELINE M CARLILE 1988 REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST

Case Summary

On 04/06/2017 FIRST AMENDMENT AND RESTATEMENT OF THE HOLLIS B CARLILE AND JACQUELINE M CARLILE 1988 REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R., Kendall, Andrew, Friedman - Retired, Gary T. and Myers, Brett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2324

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Kendall, Andrew

Friedman - Retired, Gary T.

Myers, Brett

 

Party Details

Petitioners

CARLILE, MARK

CARLILE, GREGG

Not Classified By Court

CARLILE, JACQUELINE M

CARLILE, HOLLIS B, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RENSHAW, STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Motions...returned via file & serve

Ruling

Ruling 03/10/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 01/23/2020: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- RE: TRIAL SETTING RE: PETITION FOR ORDERS PURSUANT TO PROBATE CODE SECTION 17200(B) TO DETERMINE VALIDITY OF THE THIRD AMENDMENT TO TRUST, FOR AN ACCOUNTING AND FOR FINANCIAL ELDER ABUSE

Petition

Petition 10/25/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- Petition for orders pursuant to probate code section 17200(b) to determine validity of the third amendment to trust, for an accounting and for financial elder abuse

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Objections to petiton to attorney Robert H. Brumfield for Mari Turner

Petition

Petition 07/12/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING- PETITION FOR ORDERS PURSUANT TO PROBATE CODE SECTION 17200(b) TO DETERMINE VALIDITY OF THE THIRD AMENDMENT TO TRUST, FOR AN ACCOUNTING AND FOR FINANCIAL ELDER ABUSE Notes: Need proof of publication.

Petition

Petition 06/21/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING- Petition for orders pursuant to Probate code section 17200(b) to determine validity of the third amendment to trust, for an accounting and for financial elder abuse Notes: Need service by publication on Grace J. Nicoll.

Petition

Petition 04/25/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING- Petition for orders pursuant to probate code section 17200(b) to determine validity of the third amendment to trust, for an accounting and for financial elder abuse Notes: Need publication of service on Grace Nicoll 04/25/2019 CALENDAR #1

Order to Appear

Order to Appear 04/25/2019: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: READY FOR HEARING- OSC/OTA Re Dismissal for failure to bring to trial [CCP 583.410, et seq. and CRC Rule 3.1340] 04/25/2019 CALENDAR #2

Petition

Petition 10/03/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING for orders pursuant to probate code section 17200(b) to determine validity of the third amendment to trust, for an accounting and for financial elder abuse. Notes: 1. Publication on Grace J. Nicholl not complete 2. Need verified supplement re spelling of Grace s last name. Per petition, is Nicoll not Nicholl 3. Need proof of mail service of notice of current hearing to Mari Turner and James Carlile Prob. Code 17203 4. Need notice to trustee, Errol Shaw

Petition

Petition 07/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING re: orders pursuant to probate code section 17200(b) to determine validity of the third amendment to trust, for an accounting and for financial elder abuse Notes: 1. Publication on Grace J. Nicholl not complete 2. Need verified supplement re spelling of Grace s last name. Per petition, is Nicoll not Nicholl 3. Need proof of mail service of notice of current hearing to Mari Turner and James Carlile Prob. Code 17203

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Returned to Steven J. Renshaw

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: to Steven J. Renshaw

Petition

Petition 03/22/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING- Petition re for orders pursuant to Probate code section 17200(b) to determine the validity of the Third amendment to Trust, etc. Notes: 1. No notice of hearing or proof of service filed.

Petition

Petition 01/18/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING- Petition for orders pursuant to Probate code section 17200(b) to determine the validity of the Third amendment to Trust, etc. Notes: Same note. No notice of hearing or proof of service filed.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: RENSHAW, STEVEN; Petitioner; Attorney: RENSHAW, STEVEN

Petition

Petition 11/30/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING- Petition for orders pursuant to Probate code section 17200(b) to determine the validity of the Third amendment to Trust, for an accounting and for financial elder abuse Same Note: No proof of service of the petition; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: RENSHAW, STEVEN; Petitioner; Attorney: RENSHAW, STEVEN

Petition

08/10/2017 MO: Petition for Orders Determining Validity of Trust Amendment, etc: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - Petition for orders pursuant to Probate code section 17200(b) to determine the validity of the Third amendment to Trust, for an accounting and for financial elder abuse Notes: 1. No notice of hearing or other proof of service of notice of hearing has been filed.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: RENSHAW, STEVEN; Petitioner; Attorney: RENSHAW, STEVEN

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: court trial re: petition for orders pursuant to probate code section 17200(b) to determine validity of the third amendment to trust, for an accounting and for financial elder abuse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: court trial re: petition for orders pursuant to probate code section 17200(b) to determine validity of the third amendment to trust, for an accounting and for financial elder abuse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: court trial re: petition for orders pursuant to probate code section 17200(b) to determine validity of the third amendment to trust, for an accounting and for financial elder abuse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketCourt Trial - Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Comment: court trial re: petition for orders pursuant to probate code section 17200(b) to determine validity of the third amendment to trust, for an accounting and for financial elder abuse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: court trial re: petition for orders pursuant to probate code section 17200(b) to determine validity of the third amendment to trust, for an accounting and for financial elder abuse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: court trial re: petition for orders pursuant to probate code section 17200(b) to determine validity of the third amendment to trust, for an accounting and for financial elder abuse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: court trial re: petition for orders pursuant to probate code section 17200(b) to determine validity of the third amendment to trust, for an accounting and for financial elder abuse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketCourt Trial - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: court trial re: petition for orders pursuant to probate code section 17200(b) to determine validity of the third amendment to trust, for an accounting and for financial elder abuse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Friedman - Retired, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: case management conference re: petition for orders pursuant to probate code section 17200(b) to determine validity of the third amendment to trust, for an accounting and for financial elder abuse

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketEx Parte Application / Petition - Comment: Ex Parte Application/Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Returned to Steven J. Renshaw

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: to Steven J. Renshaw

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketProof of Service Probate - Comment: Proof of Service Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketProof of Service Probate - Comment: Proof of Service Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Petition 03/22/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING- Petition re for orders pursuant to Probate code section 17200(b) to determine the validity of the Third amendment to Trust, etc. Notes: 1. No notice of hearing or proof of service filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Petition 01/18/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING- Petition for orders pursuant to Probate code section 17200(b) to determine the validity of the Third amendment to Trust, etc. Notes: Same note. No notice of hearing or proof of service filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Petition 11/30/2017: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING- Petition for orders pursuant to Probate code section 17200(b) to determine the validity of the Third amendment to Trust, for an accounting and for financial elder abuse Same Note: No proof of service of the petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - 08/10/2017 MO: Petition for Orders Determining Validity of Trust Amendment, etc: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - Petition for orders pursuant to Probate code section 17200(b) to determine the validity of the Third amendment to Trust, for an accounting and for financial elder abuse Notes: 1. No notice of hearing or other proof of service of notice of hearing has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • DocketPetition (Initiating) - Comment: Petition for orders pursuant to Probate code section 17200(b) to determine the validity of the Third amendment to Trust, for an accounting and for financial elder abuse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Renshaw, Steven J