This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:52:34 (UTC).

FIRST AMENDMENT AND RESTATEMENT OF THE ENID J SIMON TRUST

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 FIRST AMENDMENT AND RESTATEMENT OF THE ENID J SIMON TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R. and Wyatt, Ralph W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2195

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Wyatt, Ralph W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KLINK, CYNTHIA A

Not Yet Classified

SIMON, ENID J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SHAW, ERROL G

 

Court Documents

Petition

Petition 111215: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: SHAW, ERROL G

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2015
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Wyatt, Ralph W.; Comment: Confirming Trust Asset ( Probte Code Section 17200.1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition - Petition 111215: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: SHAW, ERROL G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • Proof of Service Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • Waiver - Comment: of Personal Service RE Petition for Order Confirming Trust Assets

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • Waiver - Comment: of Personal Service RE Petition for Order Confirming Trust Assets

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • Waiver - Comment: of Personal Service RE Petition for Order Confirming Trust Assets

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • Waiver - Comment: of Personal Service RE Petition for Order Confirming Trust Assets

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • Waiver - Comment: of Personal Service RE Petition for Order Confirming Trust Assets

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • Supplement - Comment: Re Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: 11/12/2015 @ 9:00am in Div. P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Probate Documents - Requested By: KLINK, CYNTHIA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Petition (Initiating) - Comment: Petition for Order confirming Trust assets (Probate code 17200.1)

    Read MoreRead Less