This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 13:15:03 (UTC).

FINNEGAN VS FINNEGAN

Case Summary

On 11/03/2016 FINNEGAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FINNEGAN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0374

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FINNEGAN, MELISSA LYNNE

Respondent

FINNEGAN, RYAN TODD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketConfidential Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketChild Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketStipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.