This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 03:36:37 (UTC).

FINCH VS MOORE

Case Summary

On 05/18/2017 FINCH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MOORE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Glennon, Donald P., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0158

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FINCH, OWEN P

Respondent

MOORE, RACHEL B

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Ruling

Ruling 06/26/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: FINCH, OWEN P; MOORE, RACHEL B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Comment: STATUS DATE 11/25/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170) - Comment: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DocketRequest For Entry of Default Not Entered - Comment: For the Following Reason(s): PREVIOUSLY ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DocketStipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Ruling - Ruling 06/26/2017:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: CNL LEGAL DOC PREP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 06/26/2017: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketAffidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less