Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:21:01 (UTC).

FINANCE AND THRIFT COMPANY VS PILKINTON ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 FINANCE AND THRIFT COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PILKINTON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1044

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FINANCE AND THRIFT COMPANY

Defendants

FORD, ALEXANDRA

PILKINTON, ANDRE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SILVER, STEVEN A

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

06/20/2016 Minute Order: OSC re: default judgment (CRC 3.740(f)): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: FINANCE AND THRIFT COMPANY; Awarded Against: PILKINTON, ANDRE; FORD, ALEXANDRA; Amount; Damages: $3,055.90; Pre-Judgment Interest: $438.75; Attorney Fees: $611.18; Costs: $450.00; Total: $4555.83

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Notice of Stay of Proceeding - Comment: as to Alexandra Ford

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN RETURNED VIA ENCLOSED ENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA ENCLOSED ENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: re: default judgment (cont'd from 06/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • Memorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: RETURNED VIA S.A.S.E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • Original Promissory Note Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - 06/20/2016 Minute Order: OSC re: default judgment (CRC 3.740(f)): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: OF RAFAELA LOCKRIDGE PURSUANT TO CCP 585D

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: substituted, as to Andre Pilkinton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: personal, as to Alexandra Ford

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: as to Alexandra Ford

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Affidavit - Comment: OF VENUE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE SECTION 2984.4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY STEVEN A. SILVER

    Read MoreRead Less