Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:20:59 (UTC).

FINANCE AND THRIFT COMPANY VS HOSKISON

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 FINANCE AND THRIFT COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HOSKISON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1039

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FINANCE AND THRIFT COMPANY

Defendants

HOSKISON, CRYSTAL

HOSKISON, CRYSTAL A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SILVER, STEVEN A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: SUBSTITUTED, AS TO, CRYSTAL A. HOSKISON AKA CRYSTAL HOSKISON. 12/28/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: AS TO, CRYSTAL A. HOSKISON AKA CRYSTAL HOSKISON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2015
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: Crystal A. Hoskison aka Crystal Hoskison

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: as to Crystal A. Hoskison aka Crystal Hoskison

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: as to Crystal A. Hoskison aka Crystal Hoskison

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: as to Crystal A Hoskison aka Crystal Hoskison

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: as to Crystal A. Hoskison aka Cryastal Hoskison

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Affidavit - Comment: OF VENUE PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE SECTION 2984.4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY STEVEN A. SILVER

    Read MoreRead Less