Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 06:23:59 (UTC).

FINANCE AND THRIFT COMPANY VS GONZALEZ

Case Summary

On 07/31/2015 FINANCE AND THRIFT COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Errea, Larry A., DelPellegrino, Victoria, Camacho, Marcos R., Shayer, Steven and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0041

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Errea, Larry A.

DelPellegrino, Victoria

Camacho, Marcos R.

Shayer, Steven

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FINANCE AND THRIFT COMPANY

Defendants

GONZALEZ, ROY M.

GONZALEZ, ROY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SILVER, STEVEN A

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

8/19/16 MO: Order to show Cause in re: Dismissal: Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

7/08/16 MO: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CRC 3.740(F): Judicial Officer(s): DelPellegrino, Victoria, Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration of Non-Service: Comment: AS TO ROY GONZALEZ AKA ROY M. GONZALEZ

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: SACRAMENTO COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs - Comment: MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • DocketAbstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Errea, Larry A.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: FINANCE AND THRIFT COMPANY; Awarded Against: GONZALEZ, ROY; Party: Names: FINANCE AND THRIFT COMPANY; GONZALEZ, ROY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF RAFAEL LOCKRIDGE PURSUANT TO CCP 585(D)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF STEVEN A. SILVER REGARDING INTEREST AND ATTORNEY FEES CALCULATION PURSUANT TO CCP 585(D)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE WITH DATE OF 08/28/2015 NOT DATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: AS TO ROY GONZALEZ AKA ROY M. GONZALEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: AS TO ROY GONZALEZ AKA ROY M. GONZALEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: FINANCE AND THRIFT COMPANY; Served: 11/28/201511:41 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Finance and Thrift is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Silver, Steven A