This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:49:02 (UTC).

FILLMORE ET AL VS VILLATORO ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 FILLMORE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against VILLATORO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brehmer, Charles R., Brumfield, Lorna H. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0454

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brehmer, Charles R.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FILLMORE, DANNY

FILLMORE, NANCE

Defendant

GUZMAN, VICTOR ALVAREZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STANLEY, MARTIN L

 

Court Documents

Further Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Further Hearing - Pre-Disposition prove-up hearing 03/24/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: PROVE-UP HEARING

Default

Default 02/08/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: **************5th CONTINUANCE**************

Default

**MO - default Public: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: /DISMISSAL. IF JUDGMENT NOT FILED BY NEXT COURT DATE, COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO PERSONALLY APPEAR. NO COURT CALL AND NO CONTRACT COUNSEL

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: TO MARTIN STANLEY: REJECTION OF JUDGMENT PACKAGE. THE JUDGMENT PACKAGE IS BEING RETURNED. THE COURT REQUIRES EXPLICIT INFORMATION SUCH AS THE CALCULATION OF INTEREST, WITH THE STARTING DATE AND HOW THE PERCENT RATE WAS DETERMINED. ALSO PLEASE REVIEW CCP 585 AND RESUBMIT DECLARATION ACCORDINGLY.

Default

Default 10/25/2016: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 07/26/2016. (judge out sick)

Default

default MO: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

**MO - Public DEFAULT MO: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: DEFAULT/DISMISSAL

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

**MO - Public osc dismissal: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 03/22/2016

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

**MO - Public osc dismissal: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Further Hearing - Pre-Disposition

**MO - Public motion & CMC: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CMC SET CON-CURRENT WITH MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Case Management Conference

**MO - Public good faith & CMC: Judicial Officer: Brehmer, Charles R.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Hearing - Pre-Disposition - Further Hearing - Pre-Disposition prove-up hearing 03/24/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RE: PROVE-UP HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault - Default 02/08/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: **************5th CONTINUANCE**************

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Comment: as to VICTOR ALVAREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration ISO Application for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault - **MO - default Public: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: /DISMISSAL. IF JUDGMENT NOT FILED BY NEXT COURT DATE, COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO PERSONALLY APPEAR. NO COURT CALL AND NO CONTRACT COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: TO MARTIN STANLEY: REJECTION OF JUDGMENT PACKAGE. THE JUDGMENT PACKAGE IS BEING RETURNED. THE COURT REQUIRES EXPLICIT INFORMATION SUCH AS THE CALCULATION OF INTEREST, WITH THE STARTING DATE AND HOW THE PERCENT RATE WAS DETERMINED. ALSO PLEASE REVIEW CCP 585 AND RESUBMIT DECLARATION ACCORDINGLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • DocketNotice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes - Comment: reassigned to Judge Thomas S Clark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault - Default 10/25/2016: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 07/26/2016. (judge out sick)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault - default MO: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: TO MARTIN STANLEY: RETURNING DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT. YOUR STATEMENT OF DAMAGES WAS ACCEPTED, HOWEVER NOT THE DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT. YOU SERVED THE STATEMENT OF DAMAGES ON 6/20/16 PERSONALLY, THEREFORE YOU MUST WAIT 30 DAYS ALLOWING DEFENDANT TO FILE ANSWER. PLEASE PROVIDE A SELF-ADDRESSED STAMPED ENVELOPE FOR ENDORSED COPIES TO BE RETURNED.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2015
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • DocketNotice of Motion - Comment: Re: Motion for Good Faith Settlement Hearing Date: 1/12/16 Hearing Time: 8:30 a.m. Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: by personal service as to Victor Alvarez Guzman.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: by personal service as to Juan Antonio Villatoro.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA PRO PER BIN "F"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/29/2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less