This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/05/2020 at 07:15:30 (UTC).

FIERROS VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 FIERROS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0016

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LAGUNAS FIERROS, MARIA X

LAGUNAS FIERROS, RODOLFO

ROCHA SALAS, ELIAZER

Defendants

GUARANTY CHEVROLET

GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

GUARANTY CHEVROLET MOTORS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

GUARANTY CHEVROLET MOTORS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIKHOV, STEVE B

Defendant Attorney

MANDEL, JACQUELINE A.

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Jackie Mandel For: Answer to Complaint RE: Case number is incorrect

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Sean Morrissey For: Answer RE: Duplicate filing received

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Sean Morrissey For: Answer RE: Answering party name must conform throughout filing, if being erroneously sued please state so on answer.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Sean Morrisey For: Answer RE: Case number is incorrect. Name for answering party must match throughout answer.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service; party served does not conform to the Complaint.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 4/20/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30am Hearing Department/Division:11

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: as to Guaranty Chevrolet Motors, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Jackie Mandel For: Answer to Complaint RE: Case number is incorrect

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Sean Morrissey For: Answer RE: Duplicate filing received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Sean Morrissey For: Answer RE: Answering party name must conform throughout filing, if being erroneously sued please state so on answer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Sean Morrisey For: Answer RE: Case number is incorrect. Name for answering party must match throughout answer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: as to General Motors LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Guaranty Chevrolet Motors, Inc. via sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: as to Proof of Service; party served does not conform to the Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 01/07/20202:42 PM; Served: 01/07/202011:46 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 4/20/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30am Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.