Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:00:13 (UTC).

FERMAN VS CABRERA

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 FERMAN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CABRERA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Witt, Gary R. and Turner, Jerold L.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0027

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Witt, Gary R.

Turner, Jerold L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FERMAN, JOSEPH

Defendant

CABRERA, KARINA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: FERMAN, JOSEPH; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 10400 Tatum Street Lamont, CA 93241 Kern; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against: CABRERA, KARINA; Party: Names: FERMAN, JOSEPH; CABRERA, KARINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer(s): Staley, H.A. "Skip", Turner, Jerold L.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • Writ of Possession Issued - Comment: Property: 1400 Tatum Street Lamont,CA 93241 Returned VIA In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: as to Karina Cabrera

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: as to Does 1-5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Personal Service as to Karina Cabrera

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: FERMAN, JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 10400 Tatum Street Lamont, CA 93241 Kern County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: Returned Via In ProPer/Counter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less