This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:54:20 (UTC).

FELIX VS FELIX

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 FELIX filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FELIX. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Loo, Cynthia L. and Gill, Susan M.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1648

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Loo, Cynthia L.

Gill, Susan M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FELIX, JENNIFER

Respondent

FELIX, DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Judgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: STATUS ENDS 06/21/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less