This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 04:24:50 (UTC).

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION VS ORTIZ, ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/01/2015 FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ORTIZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillips, Craig G., Witt, Gary R., Staley, H.A. "Skip" and Staley, H. A. "Skip". The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0025

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Phillips, Craig G.

Witt, Gary R.

Staley, H.A. "Skip"

Staley, H. A. "Skip"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION

Defendants

ORTIZ, IRMA

CORTEZ, MICHELLE

ORTIZ, MARTIN JAMIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OH, DONNA YEOWON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: Property: 9801 San Diego St-Garage Unit Lamont, CA 93241 Kern County Returned VIA ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 9801 San Diego Street-Garage Unit Lamont, CA 93241; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against: CORTEZ, MICHELLE; ORTIZ, MARTIN JAMIE; ORTIZ, IRMA; Party: Names: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION; CORTEZ, MICHELLE; ORTIZ, MARTIN JAMIE; ORTIZ, IRMA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: Possession only as to Martin Jamie Ortiz, Irma Ortiz, Michelle Cortez and All Unnamed Occupants.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: As to All Unnamed Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Substituted Service as to Irma Ortiz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Personal Service as to Martin Jamie Ortiz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Substituted Service as to Michelle Cortez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION; Served: 07/06/2015; Served: 07/03/2015; Served: 07/06/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 9801 SAN DIEGO STREET-GARAGE UNIT LAMONT, CA 93241 KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Returned Via ABC/Counter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • DocketComplaint/Unlawful Detainer Action Based on CCP 1161A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less