This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/13/2018 at 18:19:35 (UTC).

FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION, ITS ASSIGNEES AND/OR

Case Summary

On 03/27/2013 FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION, ITS ASSIGNEES AND/OR was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6126

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION, ITS ASSIGNEES AND/OR SUCCESSORS

Defendants

GODOY, COCO A.

GODOY, RICHARD, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMESON, GAYLE E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2013
  • Order to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2013
  • Proof of Service - Comment: OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2013
  • 115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION, ITS ASS... (PL-1). Received from MCCARTHY & HOLTHUS, check no(s) 87845. Receipt #717076 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • Hearing Vacated - Comment: JUDGMENT FILED ~ calid=2204195 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4191, CourtDate:06/26/2013, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:2, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LSE, Deputy:lanaes, SystemDate:3/27/2013 3:33:59 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • Writ of Possession Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • Declaration - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: AS TO RICHARD A GODOY JR, COCO A GODOY AND ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2013
  • Order - Comment: ON APPLICATION FOR SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT AND PERJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION BY POSTING AND MAILING IN UNLAWFUL DETAINER MATTER UNDER CCP 415.45 **SIGNED BY COMMISSIONER ETIENNE**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2013
  • Application - Comment: FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION BY POSTING AND MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.15.1(c) - Comment: MAILED AS STATES ON DECLARATION OF MAILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action - Comment: MAILED AS STATES ON DECLARATION OF MAILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: ENDORSED COPY RETURNED VIA A.C.S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Complaint/Unlawful Detainer Action Based on CCP 1161A - Comment: ENDORSED COPY RETURNED VIA A.C.S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: ENDORSED COPY RETURNED VIA A.C.S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action - Comment: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. _____________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 601 HIGH STREET, SUITE C, DELANO, CA 93215. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. _____________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 601 HIGH STREET, SUITE C, DELANO, CA 93215.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.15.1(c) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.15.1(c) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Jun 26, 2013 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ LINDA S ETIENNE Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.15.1(c) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON Jun 26, 2013 AT 1:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT 12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an answer or other responsive pleading, an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for entry of default, a request for dismissal, a stipulated judgment or stipulation for entry of judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ LINDA S ETIENNE Judge of the Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • 841J Pmt: Unlawful Detainer Fee <$10,000 GC 70613(B); - Comment: Amount of $240.00 for FEDERAL HOME LOAN MORTGAGE CORPORATION, ITS ASS... (PL-1). Received from ADVANCED ATTORNEY SERVICES, IN, check no(s) 111202. Receipt #709431 for amount of $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less