This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 12:06:42 (UTC).

FAVILLA VS FAVILLA

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 FAVILLA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FAVILLA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0348

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FAVILLA, ERIC ROBERT

Respondent

FAVILLA, THONGKHUN

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing; Party: Names: FAVILLA, ERIC ROBERT; FAVILLA, THONGKHUN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • DocketDeclaration for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • DocketAmended Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • DocketAmended Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less