This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:34:59 (UTC).

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE VS VETERANS RIDESHARE INC

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VETERANS RIDESHARE INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5946

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Defendant

VETERANS RIDESHARE INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AKA VETERANS RIDE SHARE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILNER, ALAN D

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 11/01/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 08/28/2018: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: cont'd from 04/25/18 and 06/26/18

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 06/26/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont. from 04/25/18. Reason for continuance: To serve defendant.

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 04/25/2018: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Other Court-Ordered Dism Before Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketOrder Dismissing Action (Full) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 11/01/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Re: imposition of additional sanctions as to plaintiff's counsel for failure to comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.740(d) and failure to appear at the Order to Show Cause hearing heard on 8/28/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 11/01/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketOrder to Appear and Order to Show Cause - Comment: 11/01/18, 830am, Dept 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 08/28/2018: Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d): Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: cont'd from 04/25/18 and 06/26/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 06/26/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont. from 04/25/18. Reason for continuance: To serve defendant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) 04/25/2018: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less