Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/07/2021 at 15:55:18 (UTC).

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE VS THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/16/2020 FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1374

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, A CALIFORNIA INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Defendants

GAZALI, ABDO

THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY, NY OF AMERICA

THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARK, KEVIN H

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 09/08/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 09/29/20 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division: 11

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of Change of Firm Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 09/08/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Removal of Action (JBSIS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Abdo Gazali via sub service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to the Travelers Indemnity Company of American via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 08/07/20201:55 PM; Served: 08/08/202012:40 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 09/29/20 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases where FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE A SUBSIDIARY OF FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where Travelers Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARK KEVIN HUNTER