Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:21:13 (UTC).

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE VS CABANSAG ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CABANSAG. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1050

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE

Defendants

CABANSAG, SAMUEL CAPALAD

CABANSAG, NIVERAS SATURNINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENSON, SUSAN M

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Minute Order- Case Management Conference 1/11/16: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 09/06/2016: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 6/14/16; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BENSON, SUSAN M

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

06/14/16 MO; Order to Show Cause Re: CRC 3.110: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: to plaintiff's counsel Re: imposition of sanctions for failing to comply with California Rules of Court, Rule 3.110; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BENSON, SUSAN M

Case Management Conference

04/05/16 MO: Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 1/11/16

Motion to Vacate (Post-Disposition)

Motion to Vacate (Post-Disposition) 03/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 1/30/17, by Plaintiff. Motion to Vacate Voluntary Dismissal. ResID: 23880.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE; Awarded Against: CABANSAG, SAMUEL CAPALAD; CABANSAG, NIVERAS SATURNINA; Amount; Damages: $9,289.51; Pre-Judgment Interest: $1,776.44; Costs: $290.50; Total: $11356.45; Party: Names: FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE; CABANSAG, SAMUEL CAPALAD; CABANSAG, NIVERAS SATURNINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Certificate of Facts Re: Unsatisfied Judgment (DL30) - Comment: Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: Abstract of Judgment with Attachment 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • Judgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: as to Samuel Capelad Cababsag; Niveras Saturnina Cabansag

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: in Opposition to Order to Show Cause

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Declaration - Comment: Plaintiff's Declaration In Support of Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Declaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2) - Comment: Declaration Regarding CCP 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Dismissal of Does I-V

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2015
  • Request For Entry of Default Not Entered - Comment: For the Following Reason(s): Defaulted already entered on 9/14/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: DEFAULT ONLY AS TO NIVERAS SATURNINA CABASANG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: personal, as to Rufino Antonio Ramirez-Aguilar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: substituted, as to Samuel Capalad Cabansag

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: personal, as to Niveras Saturnina Cabansag

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 10-27-2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY SUSAN M. BENSON CMC 1-11-2016 8:30 AM D12

    Read MoreRead Less