Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:21:04 (UTC).

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION vs. PERSONAL EXPRESS INSURANCE, A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against PERSONAL EXPRESS INSURANCE, A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1139

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION

Respondent

PERSONAL EXPRESS INSURANCE, A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HAINES, TODD F

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Other Court-Ordered Dism Before Trial (CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: substitued, as to Personal Express Insurance, A Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE, A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Petition to Compel Arbitration - Comment: AWARD AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT(CCP 1285 ET SEQ.)

    Read MoreRead Less