This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 22:36:39 (UTC).

FARM FRESH PACKAGING, LLC VS GUTIERREZ, Jr.

Case Summary

On 04/25/2016 FARM FRESH PACKAGING, LLC filed a Labor - Workplace Violence lawsuit against GUTIERREZ, Jr. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0006

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Violence

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

FARM FRESH PACKAGING, LLC

Respondent

GUTIERREZ, ELEUTERIO, Jr.

Not Classified By Court

MACIAS, ESTER C

RIVERA, BLANCA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Labrentz, Anton Heyn

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2016
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Court Finding After Court Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: FARM FRESH PACKAGING, LLC; Awarded Against: GUTIERREZ, ELEUTERIO, Jr.; Party: Names: FARM FRESH PACKAGING, LLC; GUTIERREZ, ELEUTERIO, Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketProtective Order Entered into CLETS System

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing - CLETS - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Comment: Expires on: 06/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketPetition for Harassment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • DocketNotice of New Hearing Date and Order on Reissuance - Comment: HEARING DATE: 06/24/16 TIME: 9:00 AM DIV:A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • DocketRequest to Continue Court Hearing and Reissue Temporary - Comment: Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • DocketProtective Order Entered into CLETS System

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order - CLETS (Existing)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: FARM FRESH PACKAGING, LLC; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • DocketPetition Workplace Violence

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.