This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 06/07/2020 at 09:04:48 (UTC).

FAIRSTEAD AFFORDABLE LLC VS LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 10/03/2019 FAIRSTEAD AFFORDABLE LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LOPEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0320

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FAIRSTEAD AFFORDABLE LLC

Defendant

LOPEZ, LAURA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVANS, CHRIS J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketWrit Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Cause Of ActionCause of Action: Unlawful Detainer Final Money Judgment; Type: Action; Filed By: 13786; Filed Against: 13786

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action - Action Unlawful Detainer Final Money Judgment; File Date: 01/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketDeclaration for Default - Comment: Declaration for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketRequest for Court Judgment - Comment: Request for Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: FAIRSTEAD AFFORDABLE LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 2617 POSO DRIVE #8F WASCO, CA 93280 KERN COUNTY; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: LOPEZ, LAURA; Party: Names: FAIRSTEAD AFFORDABLE LLC; LOPEZ, LAURA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: AS TO DOES 1 THROUGH 10 WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN POSSESSION IN CASE OF NAMED TENANT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: FAIRSTEAD AFFORDABLE LLC; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 2617 POSO DRIVE #8F WASCO, CA 93280 KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment: Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location - Comment: Statement of Classification and Location/Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FAIRSTEAD AFFORDABLE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EVANS CHRIS