This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:29:51 (UTC).

FAIR ET AL VS CASTLE & COOKE CALIFORNIA, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 FAIR filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against CASTLE COOKE CALIFORNIA, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S., Schuett, Stephen D. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2358

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Schuett, Stephen D.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GABRILLO, JOSE

MORENO, MELCHOR

HARTSCH, PATRICIA

JONES, SHERRY L.

KIM, DAE SUNG

ALAN MOELLEKEN TRUST

JONES, GLENDA L.

GUTIERREZ, MARTHA L.

ANGELO, RYAN

NGUYEN, THUAN

FAIR, MICHAEL

EZELL, TRAVIS

SMITH, KELVIN

MOORE, GEORGE

MARQUEZ, MARIA

FIELDER, JOHN L.

GABRILLO, JOSEPHINE

GUTIERREZ, RAMIRO

SWANSON, LIZETTE L.

Defendant

CASTLE & COOKE CALIFORNIA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

40 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDWARDS, LUCAS A

Defendant Attorney

KING, MICHAEL W

Other Attorneys

HAMMONS, WALLACE W

BUDDIE, RAYMOND M.

FIDGER, ANGELA R

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 03/05/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: No Exihbit A was attached to the Notice. Please correct and resubmit.

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 10/12/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: to post jury fees if jury trial is going to be requested. continued from 09/06/2018

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: 1.) Case Management Statement is a duplicate filing. 2.) Separate Notice of posting jury jees from case management statement and resubmit. Returned via efile

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 09/06/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 06/08/2018

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 06/08/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 04/09/2018

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Michael King Document: Answer to Complaint; Cross-Complaint; Summons Case declared complex. Include the additional $1000.00 and resubmit.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/23/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: FCMC & JT 05/26/2020 T/E 15 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: & final case management conference set con-current. estimate 15 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 03/05/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: with prejudice as to Whirlpool Corporation ONLy in the Cross- Complaint by Castle & Cooke California, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: with prejudice as to Acurate Trenching, Inc. and Rosedale Ceramic Tile & Marble in the Cross-Complaint of Castle & Cooke California, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry - Comment: of Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: No Exihbit A was attached to the Notice. Please correct and resubmit.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: with prejudice as to Hollingshead Masonry only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Minute Order dated 9/10/2019 as to Jonathan H Cannon, no forwarding address provided

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: with prejudice as to Broken Drum Insulation in the Cross complaint of Castle & Cooke California, Inc. only

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Michael King Document: Answer to Complaint; Cross-Complaint; Summons Case declared complex. Include the additional $1000.00 and resubmit.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint - Comment: ADD ADDITIONAL PLAINTIFF'S DAVID A. EVERS RON HASHIM JACALYN D. PITTMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 12/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/23/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less