This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/12/2020 at 03:29:33 (UTC).

EYHERABIDE VS HACKER

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 EYHERABIDE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HACKER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schuett, Stephen D., Bradshaw, J. Eric and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3411

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schuett, Stephen D.

Bradshaw, J. Eric

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EYHERABIDE, DENISE ANNA

EYHERABIDE

Defendants

HACKER, LEBERT CARROLL

HACKER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NORIEGA, JAMES E

Defendant Attorney

SHARIFI, PEGAH

 

Court Documents

Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

SDS Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference/Final Case Management Conference/Trial (N1):

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 06/03/2020: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 3/20/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:10

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: TE: 5 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Comment: c/c with jury trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: T/E 5 Days FCMC/JT 5/3/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf - SDS Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference/Final Case Management Conference/Trial (N1):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees - Comment: as to Lebert Carroll Hacker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 06/03/2020: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Hrg: 6/3/2020 @ 8:15 am in Dept. 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Hrg: 6/3/2020 @ 8:15 am in Dept. 10 - Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone: Pegah Sharifi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Bradshaw, J. Eric; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketRuling/Certificate of Progress - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Comment: **Granted** Request for Dismissal shall be filed by 5/11/20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: as to Lebert Carroll Hacker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Progress - Comment: requesting a 60 day extension of time to file Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Lebert Carroll Hacker via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 02/10/20209:38 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 3/20/2020 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less