This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/10/2021 at 04:56:47 (UTC).

EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY VS THOMAS ANTON & ASSOCIATES, A LAW CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/25/2020 EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THOMAS ANTON ASSOCIATES, A LAW CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1989

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

THOMAS ANTON & ASSOCIATES, A LAW CORPORATION

THOMAS ANTON AND ASSOCIATES

THOMAS J. ANTON, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEMIS, GARY A

Defendant Attorney

ANTON, THOMAS J

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/08/20 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division: 11

Ruling

Ruling 11/03/2020: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: Re: Notice of Insuffcient Filing Fees/Answer Voided

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Does not conform to CRC 3.1806 Original contract required.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceeding

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY; Awarded Against: THOMAS J. ANTON, INC; THOMAS ANTON AND ASSOCIATES; Amount; Damages: $37,103.25; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 10.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $2,969.64; Costs: $560.80; Total: $40633.69

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: Against Thomas Anton & Assoicates, a Law Corporation; Thomas J Anton, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketDeclaration and Order - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: Granting the use of copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: 585 Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration re Attorneys Fees, Interest and Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Comment: Amended as to Thomas Anton & Associates, a Law Corporation; Thomas J Anton Inc. on complaint filed 8/25/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketDeclaration and Order - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: Granting the use of copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration re CCP 585

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Insufficient Filing Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: ***VOIDED****VOIDED****VOIDED**** See Ruling dated 11/4/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 09/02/2020; Served: 09/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 12/08/20 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THOMAS ANTON & ASSOCIATES, A LAW CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Evanston Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANTON, THOMAS J