This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 13:08:04 (UTC).

EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER WITH ESSEX INSURANCE COMPANY, AS SUBROGEE OF ERNIE'S MOBILE HOME TRANSPORT, INC. VS STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, A GOVERNMENT ENTITY

Case Summary

On 11/02/2016 EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER WITH ESSEX INSURANCE COMPANY, AS SUBROGEE OF ERNIE'S MOBILE HOME TRANSPORT, INC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, A GOVERNMENT ENTITY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R., Friedman, Gary T. and Friedman - Retired, Gary T.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2613

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Friedman, Gary T.

Friedman - Retired, Gary T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER WITH ESSEX INSURANCE COMPANY, AS SUBROGEE OF ERNIE'S MOBILE HOME TRANSPORT, INC.

Defendants

STATE OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, A GOVERNMENT ENTITY

GRIFFITH COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

COFFMAN SPECIALTIES, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GRIFFITH/COFFMAN JOINT VENTURE

COFFMAN SPECIALTIES, INC.

GRIFFITH COMPANY

STATE OF CALIFORNIA, ACTING BY AND THROUGH THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHARNESS, LEIGH E

Defendant Attorneys

PELAYO, JAZMINE

WONG, JIDI

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 12/20/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 01/09/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: PELAYO, JAZMINE; Defendant; Attorney: PELAYO, JAZMINE; Defendant; Attorney: PELAYO, JAZMINE

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 10/03/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: cont'd from 07/25/17; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: CHARNESS, LEIGH E; Defendant; Attorney: PELAYO, JAZMINE; Defendant; Attorney: PELAYO, JAZMINE; Defendant; Attorney: PELAYO, JAZMINE

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 9-13-17: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 07/25/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: WONG, JIDI

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Amendments requre a signature from a Judicial Officer. Please resubmit with a designated are for Judge's signature.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Amendments require a signature from a Judicial Officer. Please resubmit with a designated area for Judge's signature.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Amendments require a signature from a Judicial Officer. Please resubmit with a designated area for Judge's signature.

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 05/02/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: WONG, JIDI

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: with Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: t/e: 4 - 5 days (jury requested by State of California)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: t/e: 4 - 5 days; same date and time as trial (jury requested by State of California)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 12/20/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Friedman - Retired, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Notice of Settlement Filed; Comment: t/e: 4 - 5 days td/cfm: 01/07/2019 (jury requested by State of California)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Unconditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: ANSWER BY DEFENANT STATE OF CALIFRONIA TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to State of California Department of Transportation. Personal Service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date:02/16/17 Hearing Time: 08:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 11/22/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GRIFFITH/COFFMAN JOINT VENTURE is a litigant

Latest cases where COFFMAN SPECIALTIES, INC . is a litigant

Latest cases where GRIFFITH COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Evanston Insurance Company is a litigant