This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:28:14 (UTC).

EVANS VS EVANS, III (D)

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 EVANS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against EVANS, III D. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bittleston, Dawn and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4160

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bittleston, Dawn

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

EVANS, CANDACE

Respondent

EVANS, WILLAM, III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HORRIGAN, GEORGE R

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RESPONSE

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: JUDGMENT/ NOTICE OF ENTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: PRO PER New Attorney:GEORGE HORRIGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketAmended Petition - Comment: 2ND AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketAmended Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: 2ND AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketEx Parte Application & Order - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Comment: TO FILE SECOND AMENDED PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketAmended Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketAmended Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketWithdrawal From Trust Fund - Comment: Processed trust refund for $7 to Candace Evans. Completed on 11/13/17. CR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less