This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 02:27:19 (UTC).

EVA CRAMER ET AL VS FCA US LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/16/2016 EVA CRAMER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brumfield, Lorna H., Clark, Thomas S., Etienne, Linda S., Lampe, David R. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1360

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Clark, Thomas S.

Etienne, Linda S.

Lampe, David R.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cramer, Eva J.

Cramer, Corey D.

Defendants

CJM Automotive Group Inc.

FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company

CJM AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, DBA BAKERSFIELD CHRYSLER-JEEP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MIKHOV, STEVE B

WIRTZ, RICHARD M

Defendant Attorney

DAVE, FORAM

 

Court Documents

Motion to Tax Costs

Motion to Tax Costs 09/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 8/1/18 Defendants, FCA US LLC; CJM AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC. DBA BAKERSFIELD CHRYSLER-JEEP Motion to Tax Plaintiffs' Costs ResID: 32612

Motion for Fees - Pre-Disposition (CL/CV)

Motion for Fees - Pre-Disposition (CL/CV) 08/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 7/12/18 Plaintiffs, EVA J CRAMER; COREY D CRAMER Motion for Attorney's Fees, Costs and Expenses ResID: 31435

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 07/30/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CRC 3.1385

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 2-23-18: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling 02/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 01/19/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FCMC 02/09/18; JURY TRIAL 02/20/18; T/E 5 DAYS

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 07/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: FCMC 08/04/17; JURY TRIAL 08/14/17; T/E 10-12 DAYS; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: WIRTZ, RICHARD M; Plaintiff; Attorney: WIRTZ, RICHARD M

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 7-21-17: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 7-19-17: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 6-29-17: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: ruling on matter submitted on 06/16/17

Order to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition)

Order to Show Cause Minute Order 06/16/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: to show cause why the court should not consolidate (1) BCV-16-102907 DR (2) BCV-16-102487 TSC (3) BCV-16-101526 TSC (4) BCV-16-100877 DRL (5) BCV-16-101360 TSC (6) BCV-16-101473 DRL for discovery and case management purposes including the appointment of a discovery referee for all cases

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 5-16-17: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 5-11-17: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: Motion - Missing Fees

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conferece minute order 12-13-16: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: DAVE, FORAM; Defendant; Attorney: DAVE, FORAM

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: continued from 07/30/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Tax Costs - Motion to Tax Costs 09/05/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 8/1/18 Defendants, FCA US LLC; CJM AUTOMOTIVE GROUP INC. DBA BAKERSFIELD CHRYSLER-JEEP Motion to Tax Plaintiffs' Costs ResID: 32612

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Comment: Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs and Expenses - Having read the motion, the memoranda and the declarations filed by the parties, the Court 4 issued the following ruling: 1. Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney's Fees, Costs and Expenses is granted, in part; 2. Plaintiffs are awarded lodestar attorney's fees in the amount of $42,370.00; 3. The Court declines to award a multiplier; 4. Plaintiffs are awarded full costs and expenses in the amount of$7,245.31; 5. Plaintiffs are awarded a total amount of attorney's fees, costs and expenses in the amountof $49,615.31. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketReply - Comment: to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Tax Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Steve Mikhov in support of Plaintiffs' opposition to Defendants' Motion to Tax Costs sought by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketObjections - Comment: Plaintiff's Evidentiary Objections to the declaration of Lisa Shwartz Tudzin in support of Motion to Tax Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketOpposition - Comment: Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Tax Costs Sought by Plaintiff's

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Notice of Order to show cause

    Read MoreRead Less
110 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2016
  • DocketAnswer to First Amended Complaint - Comment: FILED BY FORAM DAVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • DocketAnswer to First Amended Complaint - Comment: FILED BY FORAM DAVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint - Comment: First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 09/29/16 Hearing Time: 08:30 Hearing Department/Division:17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 06/21/2016; Served: 06/24/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less