This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/06/2020 at 12:50:21 (UTC).

EUGENE BURGER MANAGEMENT VS MEDINA

Case Summary

On 06/14/2006 EUGENE BURGER MANAGEMENT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MEDINA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4922

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BEAR MOUNTAIN VILLAGE

EUGENE BURGER MANAGEMENT

Defendant

MEDINA, JOSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUSSELL, MICHAEL D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/24/2006

Docket4157 Unlawful Detainer Case Management - Comment: New Calendar

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2006

Docket115A Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 1/1/06 - Comment: Amount of $15.00 for EUGENE BURGER MANAGEMENT DBA BEAR MOUNTAIN VILLAGE (PL-1). Received from EUGENE BURGER, check no(s) 13650. Receipt #254217 for amount of $15.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2006

DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered - Comment:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2006

DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2006

DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2006

DocketProof of Service - Comment: WHAT SERVED: SUMMONS,COMPLAINT,EXHIBITS AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION WHO SERVED: JOSE MEDINA HOW SERVED: PERSONAL DATE SERVED: 06/14/06

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2006

DocketPrejudgment Claim of Right to Possession - Comment:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2006

DocketComplaint - Comment:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2006

DocketSummons Issued - Comment:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2006

DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer Case Management Conference - Comment: Edit Notice

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2006

Docket841F Pmt: Unlawful Detainer Fee < $10,000 GC 70613(B); CCP - Comment: Amount of $195.00 for EUGENE BURGER MANAGEMENT DBA BEAR MOUNTAIN VILLAGE (PL-1). Received from ALAN W. NEUMAN, check no(s) 13570. Receipt #249157 for amount of $195.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2006

DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 236

[+] Read More [-] Read Less