This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/04/2020 at 16:46:31 (UTC).

EUGENE BURGER MANAGEMENT CORPORATION DBA BEAR MOUNTAIN VILLA

Case Summary

On 09/15/2004 EUGENE BURGER MANAGEMENT CORPORATION DBA BEAR MOUNTAIN VILLA was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Witt, Gary R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4498

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Witt, Gary R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BEAR MOUNTAIN VILLAGE

EUGENE BURGER MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

Defendant

LONGMIRE, ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUSSELL, MICHAEL D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2011
  • Docket134A Pmt: Photocopy GC 70627(A) EFF 1/1/06 - Comment: Amount of $1.00 for EUGENE BURGER MANAGEMENT CORPORATION (PL-1). Received from ROBERT LONGMIRE. Receipt #581422 for amount of $1.00. Detail: COPY OF ANSWER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2004
  • DocketNP1500 - Comment: Department: AL Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: EUGENE BURGER MANAGEMENT CORPORATION (PL-1) APPEARS BY MICHAEL D RUSSELL. MICHAEL D. RUSSELL DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES ON BEHALF OF THE PLAINTIFF. ROBERT LONGMIRE (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. STIPULATION OF PARTIES ENTERED INTO, BASED ON THAT STIPULATION THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT IS ENTERED: POSSESSION OF HOUSE TO PLAINTIFF AND LOCK OUT DATE OF 10/15/04. DEFENDANT TO PAY $1890.00 PAST DUE RENT, $224.30 COURT COSTS AND $450.00 ATTORNEY FEES FOR A TOTAL OF $2564.30. DEFENDANT TO PAY $100.00 PER MONTH STARTING 11/15/04 AND ON THE 15TH OF EACH MONTH THEREAFTER, UNTIL PAID IN FULL. COUNSEL FOR THE PLAINTIFF TO PREPARE ORDER. ELECTRONIC RECORDING NUMBER(S):210A/5100.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2004
  • Docket4151 Unlawful Detainer Trial - (N6a) - Comment: New Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2004
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Trial (Court) - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: UD TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2004
  • DocketNotice of Trial - Comment: New Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2004
  • DocketMemorandum to Set Court Trial Filed - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2004
  • DocketOrder on Application for Waiver of Fees - Comment: NAME OF APPLICANT: ROBERT LONGMIRE JUDGE: CRAIG PHILLIPS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2004
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: FILED BY ROBERT LONGMIRE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2004
  • DocketApplication for Waiver of Fee - Comment: REGARDING ANSWER ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2004
  • DocketSummons Issued - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2004
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2004
  • Docket841B Pmt: Unlawful Detainer <$10,000 (1/1/04) - Comment: Amount of $149.30 for EUGENE BURGER MANAGEMENT CORPORATION DBA BEAR MOUNTAIN VILLAGE (PL-1). Received from ALAN W. NEUMAN, check no(s) 10954. Receipt #121455 for amount of $149.30.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2004
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 238

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EUGENE BURGER MANAGEMENT CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where BEAR MOUNTAIN VILLAGE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUSSELL, MICHAEL D