This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 06:29:12 (UTC).

ESTRADA VS CALIFORNIA DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS "NORTH KERN STATE PRISON"

Case Summary

On 06/27/2017 ESTRADA filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CALIFORNIA DEPT OF CORRECTIONS NORTH KERN STATE PRISON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1449

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESTRADA, NICK J

Defendants

CALIFORNIA DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS "NORTH KERN STATE PRISON"

CALIFORNIA DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS

NORTH KERN STATE PRISON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PARNELL, LARAYA MICHELLE

IGRA, MISHA D

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 01/03/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: to be heard at 8:15 a.m w/cmc/osc

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 12/11/2017: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PURSUANT TO CRC RULE 3.110B (Cont'd from 10/10/17) Inmate/Plaintiff may appear by CourtCall

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: To: Nick Estrada Document: Proof of Service Proof of Service is premature. Service cannot be completed by plaintiff.

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 10/10/2017: Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: FILING NEEDS TO BE ORGANIZED. THE PLEADING AND THE SUMMONS MUST CONFORM.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: To: Nick Estrada Document: Proof of Service by Mail Proof of Service by mail returned. No Amended Complaint on file. Must use POS-010. Please seek legal advice as to how to properly complete service on named defendants.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: TO: NICK ESTRADA DOCUMENT: VARIOUS DOCUMENTS NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FORM HAS BEEN PROVIDED FOR YOUR USE. FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT IS NOT LABELED PROPERLY. PARTY NAMES ARE INCONSISTENT. MUST BE CONSISTENT WITHIN THE CAPTION OF THE COMPLAINT, BODY OF THE COMPLAINT AND YOUR PROPOSED SUMMONS. MUST SUBMIT A PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED WITH YOUR FIRST AMENDED COMPLIANT. ORGANIZE YOUR FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH THE INTENDED EXHIBITS AND MARK THEM ACCORDINGLY-I.E.- EXHIBIT 1, EXHIBIT 2, ETC. BLANK CAUSES OF ACTIONS WERE RECEIVED. PLEASE SEEK LEGAL ADVICE.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE. PREMATURE FILING

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 07/03/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Filed 6/29/2018 by Defendant, CDCR and North Kern State Prison. Ex Parte Application to Dismiss Action with Prejudice

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Motion filed 5/24/18 -- not calendared, no date specified.

Further Case Management Conference

Demurrer 05/15/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Similar Issues; Comment: to be heard with pending motions at 8:30 a.m

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 05/03/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: cont 01/03/18 03/01/18 to be heard with osc @8:15

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Motion and Demurrer - Not Calendared. Noticed for the wrong Department.

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 03/01/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: PURSUANT TO CRC RULE 3.110B (Cont'd from 10/10/17 12/11/17 01/03/18) Inmate/Plaintiff may appear by CourtCall

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RE: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS. RETURNED VIA USPS

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Unable to Forward

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: To: Nick J. Estrada, Notice of filing Remittitur on Appeal, *NO FORWARD ADDRESS*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Filing Remittitur

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketRemittitur Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of Reassignment of Counsel and Removal of Former Counsel From Service List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketOpinion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketService/Courtesy Copy Received - Comment: Respondent's Brief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketService/Courtesy Copy Received - Comment: Appellant's Brief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketService/Courtesy Copy Received - Comment: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketNotice of Lien - Comment: on proceeds on Judgment/Action/Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketFacsimile Transmission Cover Sheet - Comment: re Plaintiff's appearance for: OSC 10-10-17 at 8:30 a.m. in department 4 CMC 12-26-17 at 8:00 a.m. in department 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Comment: AS TO NICK ESTRADA. ADDITIONAL COURT FEES FW-002 DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE. PREMATURE FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Additional Court Fees - Comment: AS TO NICK ESTRADA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: AS TO NICK ESTRADA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/10/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 am Hearing Department/Division:4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: COPIES MAILED TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.