This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 10/08/2021 at 08:11:27 (UTC).

ESTRADA MEDINA VS LYONS ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/20/2020 ESTRADA MEDINA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LYONS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S., Barmann, Bernard C., Jr., Schuett, Stephen D. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0503

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.

Schuett, Stephen D.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ESTRADA MEDINA, MARIA CAROLINA

ESTRADA MEDINA

GARCIA VALADEZ, GUADALUPE DE JESUS

Defendants

LYONS, ZACHARY JOHN

HERC RENTALS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

HERC RENTALS, INC.

WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

LYONS

WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS, LLC

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

HERC RENTALS, INC.

WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SAYAGHI, HOUMAN

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

MCLAIN, MICHAEL A

JOHANNESSON, LEAH C.

Cross Defendant Attorney

KENT, EDWARD S

 

Court Documents

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 07/13/2021: Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Trial Setting per Stip dated 5/26/21

Ruling

Ruling 06/03/2021: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Answer to Cross Complaint; Duplicate Filing

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Summons on Cross Complaint; Summons does not conform to Cross Complaint

Motion for Leave

Motion for Leave 12/18/2020: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 11/17/2020 Defendant, WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS LLC Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: Request for Dismissal: Duplicate Filing Received - Dismissal for Defendant Herc Rentals has been entered. Dismissal entered on 10/9/2020

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To: Leah Johannesson For: Notice of Posting Jury Fees Reason: Fees posted untimely.

Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

SDS Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference/Final Case Management Conference/Trial (N1):

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 08/24/2020: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: re: Notice of Posting Jury Fees: Missing the $150 fee - Fees are due at the time of filing

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Proof of Service for Statement of Damages. Statement of damages missing.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date:6/8/20 Hearing Time: 830AM Hearing Department/Division:10

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: TE: 5-7 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Comment: jury: 12/05/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed; Comment: T/E 5-7 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Stipulation Filed; Comment: T/E 5-7 Days FCMC 8/20/21, JT 8/30/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketAudio streaming announced.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference - Further Case Management Conference 07/13/2021: Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Trial Setting per Stip dated 5/26/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCross Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: as to Herc Rentals, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: by personal service as to Zachary John Lyons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: as to Herc Rentals, Inc - Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 03/02/2020; Served: 02/27/2020; Served: 04/13/202011:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date:6/8/20 Hearing Time: 830AM Hearing Department/Division:10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WONDERFUL PISTACHIOS & ALMONDS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Herc Rentals, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Lyon is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCLAIN MICHAEL A.