Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:00:18 (UTC).

ESPINOZA VS MANTLE ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 ESPINOZA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MANTLE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0873

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESPINOZA, ERNEST

Defendants

MANTLE, TAMMY

MANTLE, PAT

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Hearing - Post-Disposition

8/5/15 Ex Parte on Application to Temporarily Stay Eviction Order: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Motion to temporarily stay the eviction order set for August 7, 2015 on account of extreme hardship.; Parties Present Plaintiff: ESPINOZA, ERNEST; Defendant: MANTLE, PAT; Defendant: MANTLE, TAMMY

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: ESPINOZA, ERNEST; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 11213 PRESADA CT BAKERSFIELD, CA 93311; The Lease Is Forfeited; Awarded Against: MANTLE, PAT; MANTLE, TAMMY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • Writ of Possession Returned Unsatisfied - Comment: AS TO, PAT MANTLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: KERN/ MONEY/ WES, RETURNED VIA MAIL PER REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • Application and Order - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Comment: REGARDING LOST WRIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer(s): Etienne, Linda S., Copelan, James B.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: Held in pro per bin "E"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • Declaration - Comment: of Default in Payments in Stipulation/Mediated Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • Mediation Agreement - Comment: signed by all parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Hearing - Post-Disposition - 8/5/15 Ex Parte on Application to Temporarily Stay Eviction Order: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Motion to temporarily stay the eviction order set for August 7, 2015 on account of extreme hardship.; Parties Present Plaintiff: ESPINOZA, ERNEST; Defendant: MANTLE, PAT; Defendant: MANTLE, TAMMY

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: As to Pat Mantle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: ESPINOZA, ERNEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Notice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Address and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 11213 Presada Ct Bakersfield, CA 93311

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: Returned at counter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment: In Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • Application and Order - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Comment: REGARDING LOST WRIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • Application and Order - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less