This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:08:41 (UTC).

ESPINOZA VS ARAGON (C)

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 ESPINOZA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ARAGON C. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Loo, Cynthia L. and Gill, Susan M.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4051

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Loo, Cynthia L.

Gill, Susan M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ESPINOZA, VIOLETA Y

Respondent

ARAGON, JOSE ANGEL GARCIA

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 09/17/2019: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 08/13/19 PET MOD S/S

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 09/17/2019: Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 08/13/19 PET MOD S/S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Comment: HRG 09/17/19 C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketRequest for Order (FL-300)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: 6/13/2018 REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketChild Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: STATUS ENDS: 8/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.