This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 21:21:37 (UTC).

ESPINDOLA RUIZ VS MONREAL

Case Summary

On 04/26/2016 ESPINDOLA RUIZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MONREAL. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Glennon, Donald P., Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0132

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

RUIZ, CONSTANTINO ESPINDOLA

ESPINDOLA RUIZ, CONSTANTINO

Respondent

MONREAL, LEONOR MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling 10/04/2016: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling 09/20/2016: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Default

Default 10/19/2016: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Petitioner: ESPINDOLA RUIZ, CONSTANTINO

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • Child Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Judgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • Stipulation RE: Judge Pro Tempore filed, and incorporated - Comment: herein by reference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Default - Default 10/19/2016: Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Petitioner: ESPINDOLA RUIZ, CONSTANTINO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Ruling - Ruling 10/04/2016:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: CNL LEGAL DOC PREP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Amended Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Ruling - Ruling 10/04/2016: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Ruling - Ruling 09/20/2016:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Ruling - Ruling 09/20/2016: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.