This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:34:13 (UTC).

ESCUTIA VS ANDRADE

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 ESCUTIA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ANDRADE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5937

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESCUTIA, PEDRO

Defendant

ANDRADE, GABRIEL

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RETURNED VIA PRO PER BIN "E"

Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) 01/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: ESCUTIA, PEDRO

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO COMPLAINT. RETURNED VIA PRO PER *E

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) 01/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Continued from 1/10/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RETURNED VIA PRO PER BIN "E"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: ESCUTIA, PEDRO; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 1301 COTTONWOOD BAKERSFIELD, CA 93307; Awarded Against: ANDRADE, GABRIEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA PRO PER BIN "E"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: AS TO GABRIEL ANDRADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO GABRIEL ANDRADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) 01/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA PRO PER *E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: SUMMONS DOES NOT CONFORM TO COMPLAINT. RETURNED VIA PRO PER *E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 1301 COTTONWOOD, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93307

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: ESCUTIA, PEDRO; Served: 10/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less