This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:08:22 (UTC).

ESCOBAR VS JIMENEZ MONJE

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 ESCOBAR filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JIMENEZ MONJE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Loo, Cynthia L.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4048

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Loo, Cynthia L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ESCOBAR, XIOMARA CAROLINA

Respondent

JIMENEZ MONJE, MARIO ALFONSO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: STATUS ENDS 07/24/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketDeclaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.