This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 03:35:35 (UTC).

ERICKSON ET AL VS LENOX HOMES, INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/18/2017 ERICKSON filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against LENOX HOMES, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chapin, Sidney P. and Schuett, Stephen D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1135

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chapin, Sidney P.

Schuett, Stephen D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PARKER, REGINA

GALVAN, ANDRES

DELGADILLO, NORA

DOUGLAS & SHARYN NELSON

RAMIREZ, FEDRA

JAMARCUS & DEANNA ANDRY

SANCHEZ, JOHN

PEDRO & MARIA GUZMAN

JENSEN, SHAINE

JUAREZ, ARMANDO

CRAWFORD, JAMES

SERRATO, ANDRES

ROMERO, JOSE

ERICKSON, LEIF

JUDD, WLLIAM

GUZMAN, ISRAEL

DANIEL & PALMIRA PEREZ

ANGEL AMICK & GILBERT AMICK

Defendants

STUART THOMAS, INC., A NEVADA CORP DBA LENOX HOMES

LENOX HOMES, INC

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SU, JOSEPH J

Defendant Attorneys

COPPOLA, CARLO A

LEE, DAVID S

Other Attorneys

TAYLOR, BRIAN

KNOPF, TREVOR M

ZEPEDA, MONICA M

SCHONEMAN, TINA L

CANNON, CATHERINE M

ZAPPELLI, VERONIKA J.

BROMGARD, TODD D

HUGO, HEIDI K.

CRESPO, DANIEL A

PENDLETON, MELODY RUSSELL

NADELSON, ELIZABETH P

GROSFELD, ROBERT

MOORE, DONNA E

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 08/12/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: cont 06/12/19 CRC 3.1385 Status of Finalization and dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 06/12/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CRC 3.1385 AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 04/16/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CRC 3.1385 X COMPLAINT

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 02/14/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CONT 10/10/18 12/13/18 STATUS OF X COMPLAINT- Stuart Thomas INc

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Further Case Management Conference 12/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CRC 3.1385 (Complaint)

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 10/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: cont 11/15/17 & 02/13/18 06/06/18 08/08/18

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 08/08/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: cont 11/15/17 & 02/13/18 06/06/18

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 06/06/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: cont 11/15/17 & 02/13/18

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: To: Angela R. Fidger Document: Answer of Broken Drum of Bakersfield, Inc. Check #170905 for $150.00 returned. Answer on behalf of Broken Drum of Bakersfield, Inc. has been filed by the firm of Hugo Parker LLP as of 3/07/2018.

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: RE: APPLICATION & ORDER RETURNED VIA E-FILE.

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 02/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: *CROSS COMPLAINT TO BE FILED CONT 11/15/17

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Association of attorney NEED SIGNATURE OF BOTH ATTORNEYS.

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 9/1/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:4

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: cont 06/12/19 08/12/19 finalization of settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: With Prejudice as to Cross Complaint of Stuart Thomas, Inc. a Nevada Corporation dba Lexon Homes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketNotice - Comment: Of Ruling Re: 8/12/2019 OSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 08/12/2019: Judicial Officer: Schuett, Stephen D.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: cont 06/12/19 CRC 3.1385 Status of Finalization and dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address - Comment: New Address:LAW OFFICES OF ADRIKNNE D. COHEN 1551 N. Tustin Ave., Ste. 750, Santa Ana, CA 92705

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: as to XDeft Rosedale Ceramic Tile - ONLY - With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: as to XDeft Majestice Roofing, Inc - ONLY - With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: as to XDeft Gregg's Construction & Tile, Inc - ONLY - With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: as to XDeft Central Valley Overhead Door - ONLY - With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
172 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketCase Management Order - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Comment: No. 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: In Compliance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Request for Dismissal as to Lenox Homes, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 9/1/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.