This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 11:54:47 (UTC).

ERAKAT VS BAKERSFIELD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/04/2022 ERAKAT filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BAKERSFIELD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1098

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ERAKAT, SARAH

Defendants

LOPEZ, LUIS

BAKERSFIELD CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAKHOURY ELIAS K.

Defendant Attorneys

KELLAR MICHAEL C

STREET NICHOLAS J

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued and Filed

05/11/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Complaint

05/04/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

05/04/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Case Management Conference

11/07/2022: Case Management Conference

Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

12/02/2022: Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

Case Management Statement

11/01/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

11/01/2022: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

10/27/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

10/27/2022: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

Answer to Complaint

10/27/2022: Answer to Complaint

Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

10/27/2022: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

10/27/2022: Case Management Statement

Answer to First Amended Complaint

10/24/2022: Answer to First Amended Complaint

First Amended Complaint

09/21/2022: First Amended Complaint

Ruling/Certificate of Inability

09/16/2022: Ruling/Certificate of Inability

Certificate of Inability to Respond

09/14/2022: Certificate of Inability to Respond

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

08/22/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Ruling/Certificate of Progress

08/24/2022: Ruling/Certificate of Progress

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2024
  • HearingHearing Type: Jury Trial; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2024
  • HearingHearing Type: Final Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Minute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Department 17 located at 1415 Truxtun Avenue; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ERAKAT, SARAH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ERAKAT, SARAH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Government Agency Filing; Filed By: DEFENDANT - LOPEZ, LUIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Case Management Statement; Filed By: DEFENDANT - LOPEZ, LUIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees; Comment: Defendant's Notice of Jury Deposit; Filed By: DEFENDANT - LOPEZ, LUIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: First Amended Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ERAKAT, SARAH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Ruling/Certificate of Inability; Comment: Extension Granted to 10/14/2022; Filed By: DEFENDANT - LOPEZ, LUIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Certificate of Inability to Respond; Comment: Defendant Luis Lopez only; Filed By: DEFENDANT - LOPEZ, LUIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Ruling/Certificate of Progress; Comment: extension granted; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ERAKAT, SARAH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ERAKAT, SARAH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Certificate of Progress; Comment: Request extension of time to serve; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ERAKAT, SARAH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Bakersfield City School District, a public entity, via personal service; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ERAKAT, SARAH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ERAKAT, SARAH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ERAKAT, SARAH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - ERAKAT, SARAH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less