This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 03:40:07 (UTC).

ENRIQUE S CASTRO CONSERVATEE

Case Summary

On 06/16/2015 ENRIQUE S CASTRO CONSERVATEE was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Loo, Cynthia L. and Knight, Alisa R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2146

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Loo, Cynthia L.

Knight, Alisa R.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

CASTRO, JOHN A

KERN COUNTY PUBLIC DEFENDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

OLDFIELD, GERALD H

KENDALL, ANDREW B

 

Court Documents

Petition for Fees

03/22/2017 MO: Petition for Fees: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - PETITION FOR FEES; Parties Present Petitioner: CASTRO, JOHN A; Petitioner; Attorney: KENDALL, ANDREW B

Ruling

Ruling 10/21/2016: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Court Trial

Court Trial 09/23/2016: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - PETITION FOR CONSERVATORSHIP OF PERSON AND ESTATE; Parties Present Petitioner: CASTRO, JOHN A; Petitioner; Attorney: KENDALL, ANDREW B

Case Management Conference

4/18/16 MO: Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - PETITION FOR CONSERVATORSHIP OF PERSON AND ESTATE

Petition for Appointment of Conservator

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner: CASTRO, JOHN A; Petitioner; Attorney: KENDALL, ANDREW B

Petition for Appointment of Conservator

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING ***SAME NOTES - 1. #2 of Confidential Conservator Screening form is incomplete. 2. Need Family Court Service Report. 3. #1c(3) incomplete re address of bank. 4. Capacity declaration filed on 08/04/15 with Dementia attachment is inconsistent with petition with no Dementia powers requested. Need clarification via way of verified supplement.; Parties Present Petitioner: CASTRO, JOHN A; Petitioner; Attorney: KENDALL, ANDREW B

Petition for Appointment of Conservator

Petition for appointment of conservator 111615: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING ***NOTES - 1. #2 of Confidential Conservator Screening form is incomplete. 2. Need Family Court Service Report. 3. #1c(3) incomplete re address of bank. 4. Capacity declaration filed on 08/04/15 with Dementia attachment is inconsistent with petition with no Dementia powers requested. Need clarification via way of verified supplement.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: KENDALL, ANDREW B

Petition for Appointment of Conservator

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - ***NOTES - 1. #2 of Confidential Conservator Screening form is incomplete. 2. Need Family Court Service Report. 3. #1c(3) incomplete re address of bank. 4. Need proof of service. 5. Capacity declaration filed on 08/04/15 with Dementia attachment is inconsistent with petition with no Dementia powers requested. Need clarification via way of verified supplement.; Parties Present Petitioner: CASTRO, JOHN A; Petitioner; Attorney: KENDALL, ANDREW B

Ruling

ruling 6/24/15: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2017
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Comment: Order for attorneys's fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Fees - 03/22/2017 MO: Petition for Fees: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - PETITION FOR FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: Gerald H Oldfield New Attorney: Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: 03/22/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • DocketOrder After Hearing - Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • DocketPetition for Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling 10/21/2016: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Trial - Court Trial 09/23/2016: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - PETITION FOR CONSERVATORSHIP OF PERSON AND ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • DocketCourt Interpreter Services - PB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - 4/18/16 MO: Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING - PETITION FOR CONSERVATORSHIP OF PERSON AND ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - ruling 6/24/15: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • DocketOrder and Application Dispensing Notice - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • DocketOrder Prescribing Notice - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Investigator - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • DocketConfidential Information - Comment: Identification Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • DocketReferral for Investigative Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • DocketDuties of Conservator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Conservator - Comment: Petition for Appointment of Conservator Person and Estate

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.