This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:09:45 (UTC).

ENGIN VS WEXLER

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 ENGIN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WEXLER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etienne, Linda S. and Robertson, Murray J.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2966

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etienne, Linda S.

Robertson, Murray J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ENGIN, NILAY

Defendant

WEXLER, SEAN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 12/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: ENGIN, NILAY; Defendant: WEXLER, SEAN MICHAEL

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketImage of Archived Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal After Mediation(CS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketMediation Agreement and Order - Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 12/21/2017: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (SC-104) - Comment: AS TO SEAN MICHAEL WEXLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: ENGIN, NILAY; Served: 10/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: SC-100 PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.