This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/22/2020 at 08:52:07 (UTC).

ENBAME VS DUGRENIER

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 ENBAME filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DUGRENIER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2288

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WALKER, STEPHANIE

ENBAME, RICHARD

Defendant

DUGRENIER, JAMES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Hearing Time: 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: ENBAME, RICHARD, WALKER, STEPHANIE; Served: 10/12/20206:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less