This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/29/2020 at 03:32:57 (UTC).

EMMANUEL'S V VELASCO

Case Summary

On 09/19/2013 EMMANUEL'S filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VELASCO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Errea, Larry A.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9458

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Errea, Larry A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EMMANUEL'S FURNITURE

Defendant

VELASCO, JOSE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketNP1500 - Comment: Department: BD Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: MARISSA HERRERA APPEARS AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR EMMANUELS FURNITURE(PL-1). NO APPEARANCE BY JOSE VELASCO(DE-1) PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. JUDGMENT FOR EMMANUELS FURNITURE(PL-1) AGAINST JOSE VELASCO(DE-1) FOR PRINCIPAL $748.40 COSTS $140.00. DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, BEFORE EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES (STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY). THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. ELECTRONIC RECORDING NUMBER(S):2:19PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • Docket4150 Small Claims Trial - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: CLAIM: $748.40 COST: $140.00(FILING FEE: $30 + SERVICE FEE: $110.00) PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Errea, Larry A.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: CLAIM: $748.40 COST: $140.00(FILING FEE: $30 + SERVICE FEE: $110.00) PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2013
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Errea, Larry A.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Errea, Larry A.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment: Calendar Notes: CLAIM: $748.40 COST: (Filing fee $30 + Service Fee: $ ) Proof of Service: Authorization to appear filed. Marissa Herrera/ Credit Collection will appear. CLAIM: $748.40 COST: (Filing fee $30 + Service Fee: $ ) Proof of Service: Authorization to appear filed. Marissa Herrera/ Credit Collection will appear.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: OSC ON 10/23/2013 VACATED. ~ calid=2357605 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4150, CourtDate:10/23/2013, Courtroom:BD, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:SCT, Judge:LAE, Deputy:jenniferp, SystemDate:9/19/2013 3:09:59 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • Docket854D Pmt: Small Claims Filing Fee > 12 Claims in 12 Months - Comment: Amount of $100.00 for EMMANUEL'S FURNITURE (PL-1). Received from PLAINTIFF, check no(s) 417368175. Receipt #739295 for amount of $100.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • DocketFictitious Business Name Declaration (Small Claims) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 851

    Read MoreRead Less